TX HB1394 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to automatic orders of nondisclosure of criminal history record information for certain misdemeanor defendants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to automatic orders of nondisclosure of criminal history record information for certain misdemeanor defendants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#312 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#312
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback