TX HB1382 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the availability of certain information regarding early voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the availability of certain information regarding early voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1349 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Remarks ordered printed (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#556 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1349
2021-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-18SenateRecord vote
2021-05-18SenatePassed
2021-05-18SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-18SenateRecord vote
2021-05-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18SenateAmended
2021-05-18SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-05-18SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-18SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-04SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#556
2021-04-29HousePassed
2021-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-28HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-28HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Toth
2021-04-28HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2, and Rule 11, Section 6
2021-04-28HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Toth
2021-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1382
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01382I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01382H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01382E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01382S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01382F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01382H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01382S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01382I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01382H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01382H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01382E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01382E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01382F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1382&RcdVtNo=556&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-18-F.PDF#page=19
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1382&RcdVtNo=1349&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments

feedback