TX HB1379 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to required notice prohibiting firearms at certain businesses selling or serving alcoholic beverages and the prohibition on carrying certain weapons on those premises.
Title
Relating to required notice prohibiting firearms at certain businesses selling or serving alcoholic beverages and the prohibition on carrying certain weapons on those premises.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Alex Dominguez [D] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] |
Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB549 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs