TX HB1374 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidential and privileged communications and records of victims of certain sexual assault offenses.
Title
Relating to the confidential and privileged communications and records of victims of certain sexual assault offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] |
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] | Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-04 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 295 |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB295 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
SEXUAL ASSAULT