TX HB1372 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing a petitioner for a protective order to separate the petitioner's wireless telephone number from the respondent's wireless telephone service account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing a petitioner for a protective order to separate the petitioner's wireless telephone number from the respondent's wireless telephone service account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#132
2021-04-09HousePassed
2021-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-03-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-22HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1372
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01372I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01372H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01372S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01372F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01372I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01372H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01372E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01372E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1372&RcdVtNo=132&Ch=H&Dt=04/09/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments 750

feedback