TX HB1369 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Calendars Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseReturned to Calendars Committee
2017-05-12HouseWithdrawn from calendar
2017-05-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-09HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2017-05-09HouseWithdrawn from calendar
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-01HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-25HousePosting rule suspended
2017-02-28HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-02-28HouseRead first time
2017-01-30HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback