TX HB1367 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from registration fees of certain vehicles used by nonprofit disaster relief organizations.
Title
Relating to the exemption from registration fees of certain vehicles used by nonprofit disaster relief organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
Rep. Mary Perez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2021-05-11 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (contested) |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration