TX HB1365 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-23)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, processing, distribution, transportation, research, testing, and delivery of low-THC cannabis for medical use by patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of cannabis dispensing organizations, cannabis research organizations, and cannabis testing facilities; establishing the cannabis therapeutic research review board; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, processing, distribution, transportation, research, testing, and delivery of low-THC cannabis for medical use by patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of cannabis dispensing organizations, cannabis research organizations, and cannabis testing facilities; establishing the cannabis therapeutic research review board; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1073 (Y: 128 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Amended RV#1031 (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Amended RV#1031 (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1073 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1031 |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 2-Zerwas |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 1-Middleton |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2019-04-11 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-04-08 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Governor
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MARIHUANA
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes--Drugs
Governor
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MARIHUANA
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF