TX HB1365 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-22)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, processing, distribution, transportation, research, testing, and delivery of low-THC cannabis for medical use by patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of cannabis dispensing organizations, cannabis research organizations, and cannabis testing facilities; establishing the cannabis therapeutic research review board; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, processing, distribution, transportation, research, testing, and delivery of low-THC cannabis for medical use by patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of cannabis dispensing organizations, cannabis research organizations, and cannabis testing facilities; establishing the cannabis therapeutic research review board; authorizing fees.

Sponsors

Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]
Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]
Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]
Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]
Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1073 (Y: 128 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Amended RV#1031 (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-15SenateRead first time
2019-05-07SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1073
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#1031
2019-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-06HouseAmended 2-Zerwas
2019-05-06HouseAmended 1-Middleton
2019-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2019-04-11HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2019-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2019-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2019-04-08HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-13HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback