TX HB1365 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to service records of professional staff employed by school districts.
Title
Relating to service records of professional staff employed by school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-23 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to Education | |
2009-04-27 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-26 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1578 (Similar To) 2009-03-17 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Salaries & Expenses
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Salaries & Expenses