TX HB1359 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-18)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an attorney identification card for entrance into a building that houses a court; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an attorney identification card for entrance into a building that houses a court; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback