TX HB1357 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the criminal offense of failure to report certain sexual offenses committed against a child; increasing criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the criminal offense of failure to report certain sexual offenses committed against a child; increasing criminal penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] |
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against