TX HB1355 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-26 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-26 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance and execution of a search warrant to collect a blood specimen from a person arrested for certain intoxication offenses.
Title
Relating to the issuance and execution of a search warrant to collect a blood specimen from a person arrested for certain intoxication offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] |
Rep. Mike Lang [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#410 (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#410 (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-24 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#410 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1447 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
Law Enforcement
SEARCH WARRANTS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
Law Enforcement
SEARCH WARRANTS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID