TX HB1353 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability of volunteer health care providers and health care institutions for care, assistance, or advice provided in relation to a disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability of volunteer health care providers and health care institutions for care, assistance, or advice provided in relation to a disaster.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2019-05-06HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 752
2019-05-01HousePostponed 5/3/19 10:00 AM
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB752 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback