TX HB1353 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 72-13)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 72-13)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to speed limits.
Title
Relating to speed limits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-19 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-18 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-18 | Record vote | |
2011-04-18 | Passed | |
2011-04-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-15 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-15 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-15 | Amended | |
2011-04-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-29 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Roads
County Government
County Government--Roads
Highways
Military & Veterans
SPEED LIMITS
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
City Government--Roads
County Government
County Government--Roads
Highways
Military & Veterans
SPEED LIMITS
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road