TX HB1342 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to child sexual abuse prevention training for public school students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to child sexual abuse prevention training for public school students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1890 (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Amended RV#793 (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#706 (Y: 116 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#705 (Y: 31 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenatePassed
2017-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenateAmended
2017-05-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenateAmended
2017-05-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-25SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably as amended
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-11SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-11SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed as amended
2017-05-04HouseAmended
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-03HouseAmended
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-27HouseRead first time
2017-01-30HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1342
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01342I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01342H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01342E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01342S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01342F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1342&RcdVtNo=705&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1342&RcdVtNo=706&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1342&RcdVtNo=793&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1342&RcdVtNo=1890&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=221

Bill Comments

feedback