TX HB1340 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the extent of a defendant's criminal responsibility for the conduct of a coconspirator in a capital murder case and the review of certain convictions by the Board of Pardons and Paroles.
Title
Relating to the extent of a defendant's criminal responsibility for the conduct of a coconspirator in a capital murder case and the review of certain convictions by the Board of Pardons and Paroles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#728 (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Amended RV#709 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Amended RV#709 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-05 | House | Record vote RV#728 |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#709 |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-04 | House | Amended 2-S. Thompson, Moody, Canales, Cain, and Leach |
2021-05-04 | House | Amended 1-Leach |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment