TX HB1331 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 224; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 224; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18 Effective immediately
2017-05-18 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-08 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-08SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-05HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-05HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-04HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-02SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-02SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-02SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Administration
2017-04-26SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-19HouseRules suspended
2017-04-21HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-05HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-24HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2017-02-27HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2017-02-27HouseRead first time
2017-02-15HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2017-01-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback