TX HB1331 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the treatment and recycling for beneficial use of certain waste arising out of or incidental to the drilling for or production of oil or gas.
Title
Relating to the treatment and recycling for beneficial use of certain waste arising out of or incidental to the drilling for or production of oil or gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - HB 1331Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2015-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed |