TX HB133 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to education benefits at public institutions of higher education for certain survivors of public servants.
Title
Relating to education benefits at public institutions of higher education for certain survivors of public servants.
Sponsors
Rep. Jacey Jetton [R] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] |
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#140 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#140 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Effective immediately | |
2021-10-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-10-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-10-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-18 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Passed |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-10-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-10-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-10-17 | House | Record vote RV#140 |
2021-10-17 | House | Passed |
2021-10-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-17 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-10-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-10-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-10-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-10-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-10-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-10-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-10-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-10-15 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2021-10-15 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-10-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-09-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
CALEB RULE'S LAW
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Tuition
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Tuition
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel