TX HB1327 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Veterans Commission.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Veterans Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB601 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Military & Veterans
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1327 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01327I.htm |