TX HB1326 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to a plan to replenish the food supplies of food banks or food pantries following a disaster.
Title
Relating to a plan to replenish the food supplies of food banks or food pantries following a disaster.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-20 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-14 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-14 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-11 | Postponed | |
2009-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-06 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |