TX HB1324 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to equal opportunity for access by home-schooled students to University Interscholastic League sponsored activities; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to equal opportunity for access by home-schooled students to University Interscholastic League sponsored activities; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] |
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB718 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Home Schooling
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Home Schooling
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1324 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01324I.htm |