TX HB1314 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the release on personal bond of a person who is pregnant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the release on personal bond of a person who is pregnant.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-27HouseRead first time
2017-01-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback