TX HB1311 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the election of trustees of certain school districts.
Title
Relating to the election of trustees of certain school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1869 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Elections
Elections--School District
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Elections
Elections--School District