TX HB1300 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reading and marking of a ballot by a person occupying a voting station or by the person's child.
Title
Relating to the reading and marking of a ballot by a person occupying a voting station or by the person's child.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] | Rep. Sergio Munoz [D] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#730 (Y: 125 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-05 | House | Record vote RV#730 |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-04 | House | Amended 1-Martinez Fischer |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |