TX HB1300 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligibility requirements for admission of certain persons to educator preparation programs.
Title
Relating to eligibility requirements for admission of certain persons to educator preparation programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - HB 1300Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-16 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR