TX HB1300 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to funding for state sites and programs of the Parks and Wildlife Department through private contributions and partnerships and to commercial advertising on certain state sites.
Title
Relating to funding for state sites and programs of the Parks and Wildlife Department through private contributions and partnerships and to commercial advertising on certain state sites.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] | Rep. Joe Farias [D] | Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | Effective immediately | |
2011-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-17 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-13 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-12 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-12 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed | |
2011-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-12 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-03 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-07 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-06 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-06 | Record vote | |
2011-04-06 | Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Filed |
Subjects
ADVERTISING
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--General
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--General
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources