TX HB1300 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Kennedale TownCenter Development District; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Kennedale TownCenter Development District; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Effective immediately | |
2009-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-14 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-14 | Record vote | |
2009-05-14 | Passed | |
2009-05-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-14 | Record vote | |
2009-05-14 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-14 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-14 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-04-15 | Read first time | |
2009-04-14 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-03-30 | Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-27 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | |
2009-03-27 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | |
2009-03-24 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-02-16 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-02-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2068 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Subjects
BONDS
KENNEDALE TOWNCENTER DEVELOPMENT DISTRICT
KENNEDALE, CITY OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
KENNEDALE TOWNCENTER DEVELOPMENT DISTRICT
KENNEDALE, CITY OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous