TX HB13 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 85-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reporting requirements by certain physicians and health care facilities for abortion complications; authorizing a civil penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reporting requirements by certain physicians and health care facilities for abortion complications; authorizing a civil penalty.

Sponsors

Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]
Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Gary Elkins [R]
Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Sen. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]
Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]
Sen. Donna Campbell [R]

Roll Calls

2017-08-11 - Senate - Reason for vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#19 (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Record vote RV#15 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Amendment tabled RV#14 (Y: 92 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - RV#12 RV#13 (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Amendment tabled RV#12 (Y: 92 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - RV#11 (Y: 105 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-15 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
2017-08-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-08-13 Sent to the Governor
2017-08-13SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-08-12HouseSigned in the House
2017-08-11HouseReported enrolled
2017-08-11HouseSenate passage reported
2017-08-11SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-11SenateRecord vote
2017-08-11SenatePassed
2017-08-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-08-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-08-11SenateRecord vote
2017-08-11SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2017-08-11SenateRecord vote
2017-08-11SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-11SenateRead 2nd time
2017-08-11SenateRecord vote
2017-08-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-08-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-08-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-08-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-08-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-08-01SenateRead first time
2017-07-31SenateReceived from the House
2017-07-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-07-28HouseRecord vote
2017-07-28HousePassed
2017-07-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-07-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-07-27HouseRecord vote
2017-07-27HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-07-27HouseRecord vote
2017-07-27HouseAmendment tabled
2017-07-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-07-27HouseRecord vote
2017-07-27HouseAmended
2017-07-27HouseRecord vote
2017-07-27HouseAmendment tabled
2017-07-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-07-27HouseRecord vote
2017-07-27HouseAmended
2017-07-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-07-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-07-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-26HouseCorrected committee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-26HouseCorrected comm. report distributed
2017-07-25HouseCorrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
2017-07-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-07-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB13
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00013I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00013H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00013E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00013S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00013F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB13&RcdVtNo=11&Ch=H&Dt=07/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB13&RcdVtNo=12&Ch=H&Dt=07/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB13&RcdVtNo=13&Ch=H&Dt=07/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB13&RcdVtNo=14&Ch=H&Dt=07/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB13&RcdVtNo=15&Ch=H&Dt=07/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB13&RcdVtNo=19&Ch=H&Dt=07/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-11-F2.PDF#page=21
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-11-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback