TX HB1299 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the sale of distilled spirits at a temporary location by the holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the sale of distilled spirits at a temporary location by the holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB823 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback