TX HB1291 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the instructional material list and supplemental instructional materials and the inclusion of American principles in those materials and the public school curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the instructional material list and supplemental instructional materials and the inclusion of American principles in those materials and the public school curriculum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Passed to 3rd reading as amended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - FA1 Campbell (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#955 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Read 2nd time RV#866 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateReturned from the House for further action
2017-05-22HouseReturned to the Senate for further action
2017-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateAmended
2017-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateAmended
2017-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-18SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-27HouseRead first time
2017-01-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback