TX HB1290 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-18 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-18 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority for local governments to jointly administer transportation reinvestment zones.
Title
Relating to the authority for local governments to jointly administer transportation reinvestment zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-12 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-11 | House | Amended |
2013-04-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-04-10 | House | Postponed |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |