TX HB1287 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prima facie speed limit on certain streets and highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prima facie speed limit on certain streets and highways.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-04HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1023 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback