TX HB1280 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 69-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibition of abortion; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibition of abortion; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors

Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]
Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]
Sen. Angela Paxton [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]
Sen. Charles Perry [R]

Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#793 (Y: 81 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Point of order sustained (amendment) RV#777 (Y: 80 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 See remarks for effective date
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-11SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#793
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#777
2021-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-05HousePoint of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3
2021-05-05HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Slaton
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB391 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to State Affairs
SB9 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1280
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01280I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01280H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01280E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01280S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01280F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01280H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01280I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01280H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01280H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01280E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01280E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1280&RcdVtNo=777&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1280&RcdVtNo=793&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=40
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=141

Bill Comments 750

feedback