TX HB1280 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to contracts between dentists, optometrists, or therapeutic optometrists and health maintenance organizations or insurers.
Title
Relating to contracts between dentists, optometrists, or therapeutic optometrists and health maintenance organizations or insurers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DENTISTS & DENTISTRY
EYECARE & VISION
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
OPTOMETRY & OPTOMETRISTS
THERAPEUTIC OPTOMETRISTS
EYECARE & VISION
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
OPTOMETRY & OPTOMETRISTS
THERAPEUTIC OPTOMETRISTS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB1280 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB01280I.htm |