TX HB1277 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requirements for annexation of certain commercial or industrial areas by a general-law municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for annexation of certain commercial or industrial areas by a general-law municipality.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Effective immediately
2015-06-17 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenatePassed
2015-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-04SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2015-05-04SenateRead first time
2015-04-29SenateReceived from the House
2015-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2015-04-29HouseRecord vote
2015-04-29HousePassed
2015-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-28HousePassed to engrossment
2015-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-04HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2015-03-04HouseRead first time
2015-02-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback