TX HB1276 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the assignment of a public school student to an uncertified teacher.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the assignment of a public school student to an uncertified teacher.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#746 (Y: 78 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Education
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#746
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-24HouseAmended 1-Schaefer
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback