TX HB1273 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to denial of payment for preauthorized health care or dental care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to denial of payment for preauthorized health care or dental care services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#937 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-06SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#937
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-01HouseAmended 2-Zedler
2019-05-01HouseAmended 1-Zedler
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback