TX HB1266 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study of the practice of advanced practice registered nurses and the authority of those nurses to prescribe and order prescription drugs.
Title
Relating to a study of the practice of advanced practice registered nurses and the authority of those nurses to prescribe and order prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Rob Orr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | Filed |
Subjects
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
PHYSICIANS
REGISTERED NURSES
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
PHYSICIANS
REGISTERED NURSES