TX HB1264 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the time for making required reports of deceased residents of this state to a voter registrar and to the secretary of state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the time for making required reports of deceased residents of this state to a voter registrar and to the secretary of state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#148 (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-04-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-13SenateRead first time
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#148
2021-04-09HousePassed
2021-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-08HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB569 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1264
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01264I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01264H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01264E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01264S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01264F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01264I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01264H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01264H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01264E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01264E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1264&RcdVtNo=148&Ch=H&Dt=04/09/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments

feedback