TX HB1263 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy.
Title
Relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-14 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BOARD OF PHYSICAL THERAPY EXAMINERS, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICAL THERAPISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICAL THERAPISTS