TX HB1262 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the extended registration of certain vehicles not subject to inspection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the extended registration of certain vehicles not subject to inspection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1693 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#695 (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Amendment tabled RV#646 (Y: 106 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Effective immediately
2019-06-05 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1693
2019-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#695
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#646
2019-04-24HouseAmendment tabled 1-Middleton and White
2019-04-24HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-04-24HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Middleton and White
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1262
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01262I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01262H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01262E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01262S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01262F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1262&RcdVtNo=646&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1262&RcdVtNo=695&Ch=H&Dt=04/25/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-15-F1.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1262&RcdVtNo=1693&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2019

Bill Comments

feedback