TX HB1260 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of commercial shrimp unloading; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of commercial shrimp unloading; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#378 (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#370 (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#369 (Y: 16 N: 115 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#368 (Y: 19 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#367 (Y: 23 N: 104 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-05-04SenateRead first time
2017-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-25HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25HouseRecord vote
2017-04-25HousePassed
2017-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-24HouseRecord vote
2017-04-24HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-24HouseRecord vote
2017-04-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-24HouseRecord vote
2017-04-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-24HouseRecord vote
2017-04-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2017-02-23HouseRead first time
2017-01-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1260
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01260I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01260S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01260F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1260&RcdVtNo=367&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1260&RcdVtNo=368&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1260&RcdVtNo=369&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1260&RcdVtNo=370&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1260&RcdVtNo=378&Ch=H&Dt=04/25/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=60

Bill Comments

feedback