TX HB1258 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to information publicly available in a state court document database; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to information publicly available in a state court document database; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1067 (Y: 127 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-18SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-08HouseAmended
2017-05-08HouseAmended
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-02-23HouseRead first time
2017-01-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback