TX HB1255 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to patient records regarding maternal death.
Title
Relating to patient records regarding maternal death.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. John Wray [R] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] |
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB559 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - House passage as amended reported
Subjects
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
MEDICAL RECORDS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
MEDICAL RECORDS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women