TX HB1252 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . September 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . September 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the limitation period for filing a complaint and requesting a special education impartial due process hearing.
Title
Relating to the limitation period for filing a complaint and requesting a special education impartial due process hearing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1658 (Y: 113 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Remarks ordered printed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#980 (Y: 95 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Remarks ordered printed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#980 (Y: 95 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . September 1, 2022 | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1658 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#980 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special