TX HB125 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the law governing the provision of state aid to certain local governments disproportionately affected by the granting of ad valorem tax relief to disabled veterans.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the law governing the provision of state aid to certain local governments disproportionately affected by the granting of ad valorem tax relief to disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB524 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions