TX HB1241 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to student success-based funding recommendations for certain public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to student success-based funding recommendations for certain public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-22HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-02-22HouseRead first time
2017-01-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback