TX HB1238 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to provisions governing the carrying of a firearm by a person who is not otherwise prohibited by state or federal law from possessing the firearm and to other provisions related to the carrying, possessing, transporting, or storing of a firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to provisions governing the carrying of a firearm by a person who is not otherwise prohibited by state or federal law from possessing the firearm and to other provisions related to the carrying, possessing, transporting, or storing of a firearm.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback